Financial history UNITAS

Charity number: 1133286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.20m £2.23m £1.56m £1.58m £1.74m
Total expenditure £1.21m £2.38m £1.55m £1.48m £1.56m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £1.00m £1.00m N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £500.00k £300.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £422.00k £953.65k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £779.21k £1.28m £1.56m £1.58m £1.74m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.20k £1.25k £1.08k £239 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £786.64k £1.43m £1.55m £1.48m £1.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.87k £0 £14.36k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £190.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £422.00k £953.65k £0 £0 £0