Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - FREEDOM HOUSE FOR ALL NATIONS
Charity number: 1131515
Charity reporting is overdue by 164 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.46k | £45.99k | £51.67k | £37.93k | £24.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.71k | £44.77k | £40.73k | £47.84k | £29.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.