KEREN ANIYEI ERETZ YISROEL

Charity number: 1132993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 08 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required