THE SACKLER TRUST

Charity number: 1132097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.34m £17.67m £1.41m £1.89m £512.71k
Total expenditure £21.33m £7.46m £5.15m £576.32k £1.14m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.97m £17.43m £528.37k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £1.25m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.37m £239.01k £878.89k £638.37k £512.71k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.12m £7.25m £4.90m £323.97k £872.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds £205.93k £210.72k £247.40k £252.36k £266.10k
Expenditure - Governance £5.20k £4.99k £4.99k £6.50k £6.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution £21.12m £7.25m £4.90m £317.47k £866.19k
Expenditure - Investment management £205.93k £210.72k £247.40k £252.36k £266.10k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0