ST MARY LYNCOMBE EXMOOR TRUST

Charity number: 1137788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.98k £2.48k £4.03k £250 £5.21k
Total expenditure £4.54k £1.12k £1.40k £10 £3.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A