Financial history SAVE THE ORANGUTAN

Charity number: 1133204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £71.11k £21.36k £23.39k £23.99k £100.10k
Total expenditure £80.56k £12.91k £13.22k £26.80k £48.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A