Accounts and annual returns THE HESKEL SETTY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1135932
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 16 August 2015 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 16 August 2015 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window