Accounts and annual returns CLAPHAM EAGLES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1133330
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required