INTERNATIONAL BAR ASSOCIATIONS HUMAN RIGHTS INSTITUTE TRUST

Charity number: 1133427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £507.75k £448.98k £545.57k £819.14k £180.32k
Total expenditure £455.79k £533.88k £455.05k £367.83k £151.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £506.28k N/A £544.63k £627.10k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £190.12k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.47k N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £945 £1.93k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £455.79k N/A £455.05k £367.83k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A