Trustees TRENANCE COTTAGES NEWQUAY
Charity number: 1134308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILLIAN WILLMOTT | Chair | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
Simon Thomas Fernley | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jenkin | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE COLLINSON | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ann Moore | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM GRAVES | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR RONALD FULLWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Christopher James BLOUNT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAVIS ANN SUTHERLAND WARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD ALLAN RAWSON O'DELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.