Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT'S CHURCH
Charity number: 1133078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Thomas James Harvey | Chair | 21 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Hannah Lisa Simpson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Elizabeth Head | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Margaret Gibson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eveline Paige | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Graham | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Dunn | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jayne Bell | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GILLIAN TIFFIN | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|||||
PAUL GILMORE | Trustee |
|
||||||
HYLDA EILEEN HOPPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN GILMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN DUCKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.