Governance Royal Marines Association - The Royal Marines Charity

Charity number: 1134205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 08 February 2010: Standard registration
  • 23 January 2014: Funds received from 1059483 THE ROYAL MARINES COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
  • 09 November 2020: Funds received from 1168387 THE ROYAL MARINES ASSOCIATION LIMITED
  • 22 March 2022: Funds received from 1157543 RM CLUB BRANCH LIMITED
  • 27 October 2022: Funds received from 1134205-2 THE C GROUP SUPPORTING THE RMS
  • 08 May 2024: Funds received from 1170698 ROYAL MARINES HERITAGE TRAILS (DEAL AND WALMER)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • RMA - The Royal Marines Charity (Working name)
  • RMA-The Royal Marines Charity (Previous name)
  • ROYAL MARINES CHARITABLE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
  • THE ROYAL MARINES CHARITY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property