THE DAN MASKELL TENNIS TRUST

Charity number: 1133589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £77.89k £85.13k £98.84k £116.32k £100.20k
Total expenditure £111.94k £112.69k £122.61k £134.44k £117.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A