Financial history AGHAPY TV LIMITED

Charity number: 1136452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £14.56k £14.53k £14.28k £13.62k £12.51k
Total expenditure £655 £40.24k £13.16k £584 £9.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A