BLACK COUNTRY FOOD BANK LIMITED

Charity number: 1136676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £98.60k £65.34k £422.19k £485.23k £630.41k
Total expenditure £76.89k £81.34k £418.78k £494.27k £624.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £11.60k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £629.95k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £459
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £112.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £512.05k