Trustees ASSOCIATION FOR COGNITIVE ANALYTIC THERAPY LTD
Charity number: 1141793
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacintha Marie Christiane Emilion | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayden Simeon Stothard | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Portman | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Walton | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Yabsley | Trustee | 14 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jay Dudley | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Harrison | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Payne | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rabhya Dewshi | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Coshland | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Shannon | Trustee | 26 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.