Trustees THE METHODIST CHURCH, WALSALL CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rachel Wood | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Westbury | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janice Cox | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Ndoho | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Gardner | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Malsbury | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Beattie | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jopling | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sue Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Cummings | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Annette Cleaver | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Reilly | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Gibbons | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN RUSHTON | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev COLIN GARDNER | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Philip Broadbent | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Anne Huskisson | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony Vass | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Butler | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Barry Gibbons | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
William Alan Wilkes | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN MARY MCBRIDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILL JOLLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY MARY BUCHANAN B ED | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALAN OWEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARY PAULINE VASS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.