DARLINGTON (GACMADHEERE) FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1135879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £10.99k £12.65k £17.54k £21.28k £20.15k
Total expenditure £7.92k £27.52k £23.37k £11.58k £21.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A