Trustees ST ALBANS AND WELWYN METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
32 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Holt | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Gillian Demianyk | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Bowler | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ERIC CHARLES BRIDGSTOCK | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Jane Lewis | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Myra Sloper | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Pretty Nkiwane | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diana Holt | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
REV David Mullins | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Maziane | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Enid June Stork | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DENISE MARGARET WILLINGHAM | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK HANCOCK | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Scorer | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN STUBBS | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
REV John Churcher | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Prout | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Angela Christina Andrews | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Elisabeth Rose | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
ROBERT HARVEY WARD | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Hazel Marian Laming | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Carl Meredith | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Janis Lynn Gilbert | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Louise Margaret Bourton | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY OSTLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE KAY CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART FINLAY JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BOB CAMERON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY HERBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV PETER HUDSON B.A., M.A. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GUY ALAIN FENNER | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.