Financial history HARROW LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1134778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £332.43k £430.16k £378.82k £601.62k £737.82k
Total expenditure £320.48k £364.21k £414.83k £452.35k £650.41k
Income from government contracts £112.99k £204.52k £160.84k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.93k £6.35k N/A £30.00k £36.17k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £288.46k £455.86k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £27 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £313.13k £281.92k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £33
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £452.35k £650.41k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £4.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0