MILDMAY COMMUNITY NURSERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1135043
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £372.71k £376.35k £358.13k £369.21k £425.02k
Total expenditure £349.72k £366.81k £383.30k £3.93m £399.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £114.70k £115.59k £109.50k £101.69k £129.21k