Trustees OXFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryony thomas | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Powers | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Miriam Moul | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Catherine Mary Lines | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hawkness-Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Boylan | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Clack | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Dodds | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rowland Spray | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn King | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Crockett | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Graham Carter | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
DR Andrew Michael Quigley | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jan Boylan | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mel McCulloch | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HERRIOTT LENTON | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Alicia Rumsby | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMEON JOSEPH MITCHELL | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
JOHN WINTERBOTTOM | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Christopher Andrew Butler | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON PHILIP BLAINEY BA MSC | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALISON SARA MATTHEWS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alan Timothy Bailey | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN GOMM | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|||||
EMMA KATHRYN HUBER | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARRIE ERNEST EDWARDS | Trustee | 24 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP RUMSBY | Trustee | 03 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP RONALD CROCKETT | Trustee | 17 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JAMES JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANN PATRICIA LECK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEREMY JOHN BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA CLAPTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM LINDSAY KIRBY ACIB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEREMY BOURNE DAWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNA TULLOCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIOLET MAY BANBURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE SANDRA WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.