Financial history ECFR

Charity number: 1143536
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.28m £7.27m £7.28m £5.00m £4.56m
Total expenditure £7.24m £7.03m £6.71m £4.42m £4.01m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £185.74k £211.28k £91.03k £1.32m £1.19m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.03m £1.29m £1.16m £296.86k £243.34k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.24m £5.91m £6.05m £4.71m £4.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £389 £451 £0 £4 £1
Income - Other £9.31k £66.45k £78.49k £1.57k £473
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.79m £3.88m £4.46m £4.37m £3.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £449.97k £329.90k £0 £54.17k £39.79k
Expenditure - Governance £58.23k £15.82k £15.76k £48.62k £34.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.27m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £2.82m £2.24m £0 £0