BLYTHWOOD COMMUNITY NURSERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1136138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £212.50k £167.87k £155.34k £176.80k £192.67k
Total expenditure £188.65k £188.62k £174.69k £172.64k £201.62k
Income from government contracts £89.70k £53.38k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.06k £23.31k £68.08k £114.18k £126.16k