VOICE FOR THE AFRICAN DISABLED IN UK

Charity number: 1137264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 August 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 18 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required