ST BEDE'S CHILDCARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1137866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.40m £2.31m £2.25m £2.18m £2.03m
Total expenditure £2.38m £2.22m £2.16m £2.06m £1.97m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £15.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £9.85k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.40m £2.31m £2.25m £2.18m £1.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £380 £254 £319 £250 £236
Income - Other £0 £0 £2.26k £0 £270.32k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.38m £2.22m £2.16m £2.06m £1.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.10k £6.26k £7.58k £7.08k £7.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0