Financial history WEST MERCIA RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity number: 1136677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £992.21k £1.47m £2.14m £2.34m £2.56m
Total expenditure £1.02m £1.44m £1.91m £2.12m £2.39m
Income from government contracts £756.98k N/A £1.38m £1.27m £851.81k
Income from government grants £0 £1.39m N/A £901.15k £1.35m
Income - Donations and legacies £18.66k £13.78k £32.39k £31.88k £11.73k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £973.18k £1.46m £2.10m £2.31m £2.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £363 £53 £146 £168 £20
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.44m £1.91m £2.12m £2.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.82k £4.50k £3.90k £3.90k £7.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0