Accounts and annual returns STABLE AND PROSPEROUS DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1135867
Charity reporting is overdue by 1533 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 72 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 72 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 438 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 438 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 803 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 803 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1168 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1168 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1533 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1533 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window