Charity overview EDWARD LAWRENCE
Charity number: 207496-14
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 23 APRIL 1937, 27 SEPTEMBER 1960, 9 FEBURARY 1967, 4 DECEMBER 1972 AND 15 SEPTEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
PROPERTY TRANSFERRED TO:
1) THE CRIPPLEGATE FOUNDATION;
2) THE PAROCHIAL EDUCATIONAL AND APPRENTICING FOUNDATION;
3) ST LUKE'S PAROCHIAL CHARITIES;
4) CHARITY FOR THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST LUKE, OLD STREET.
Area of benefit
ST GILES CRIPPLEGATE AND ST LUKE OLD STREET
Registration history
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 03 December 1980: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.