ANIMAL AWARENESS

Charity number: 1138674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.44k £3.91k £7.12k £5.10k £8.53k
Total expenditure £5.45k £5.99k £6.18k £6.45k £6.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A