Charity overview MISS ELLEN REARDON'S BEQUEST
Charity number: 208878-6
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED 1 MARCH 1880 DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 FEBRUARY 1882 AND SCHEME OF 2 JULY 1975
Charitable objects
GRANTING ANNUITIES OF SUCH AMOUNT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN CASES OF NEED TO SOLICITORS OR THEIR WIDOWS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
- 22 October 1962: Standard registration
- 27 July 1995: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.