Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES' BIRKDALE
Charity number: 1127793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JONATHAN PETER FOX | Chair | 14 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev Samuel Mark Johnson | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Coull Foster | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Allan Salisbury MBE | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher David Medwyn Roberts | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Amanda Ludlow | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Andrew Downham MB, ChB | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Margaret Downham | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN HARRISON | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Carol Barnes | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DIANE ELIZABETH HARRISON | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD BENNETT | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Ampat | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS NELSON | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MIKE LOWCOCK | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL LACEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.