CHRIST OVERCOMER'S INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1127135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £19.46k £16.07k £11.92k £14.93k £18.44k
Total expenditure £12.97k £14.29k £12.43k £13.27k £10.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A