Trustees REDHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1130897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek May | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Pitts | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Parnell | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Goodhind | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chitradevi Jaganathan | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gillian Rosemary Baalham | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raseen Joseph | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Peter | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Lawrence | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Anne Catherine Branson Mrs | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Penna | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edward Newton | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Rex William Giles | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heather Snowdon | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Willock | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
LORRAINE HEIDI VALLER | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH GREGORY | Trustee | 28 August 2012 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN GEORGE | Trustee | 04 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Helen Greaves | Trustee | 04 September 2011 |
|
|||||
PAULINE JANET NEWTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR K J NEWBURY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS R E WILLOCK | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID EDWARD PENNA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.