THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, PETERBOROUGH

Charity number: 1127813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £103.32k £170.91k £259.02k £107.37k £111.18k
Total expenditure £110.36k £245.42k £282.23k £141.13k £117.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £55.93k £0 N/A N/A