Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ICKENHAM
Charity number: 1130247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev FELICITY DAVIES | Chair | 03 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Tristram Patrick Taverner | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Alison Duff | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Jane Douglass | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Sawyer | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Keith Oldfield | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Navina Thompson | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Martin Edwards | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULI DIANE HARRIS POWELL | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Darren Guttridge | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jayne Varley | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Emma Therese Taylor | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Louise Hodgson | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|||||
SALLY ANNE BLACKMAN | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY HODGSON | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|||||
COLIN WILLIAM BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN THOULD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.