THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER, FORMBY

Charity number: 1128383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Elizabeth Howard Gorman Trustee 19 April 2011
ST PETER'S FORMBY EDUCATIONAL TRUST 2015 Received: On time
STEVEN ANDREW EDWARDS Trustee None on record
Rev Simon Macaulay Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
JOHN DESMOND RYAN Trustee None on record
MICHAEL YATE PITTS Trustee
THE LIVERPOOL DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
GILL HOLROYD Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Roderick Hugh Jacques Trustee 27 April 2014 None on record
Rev Anne Taylor Chair 11 May 2014
CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES OF THOMAS BROWN AND MARSH DOLE FORMBY Received: On time
JOANNE DEAN Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
SUSAN FLAXINGTON Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
ROBERT CLIFFORD COTSWORTH Trustee
AUGHTON MALE VOICE CHOIR Received: On time
Anne Cotsworth Trustee None on record
ANDREW GREENYER Trustee 16 July 2011 None on record
Keith Millington Trustee 24 May 2021
FORMBY BENEVOLENT TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY LIMITED Received: On time
PAUL MCHENRY Trustee 22 April 2018
ST PETER'S FORMBY EDUCATIONAL TRUST 2015 Received: On time
PATRICIA BARRETT Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record
SHENA MARY EDWARDS Trustee None on record
Jannice Crawford Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
Irvine Rawcliffe Trustee 09 April 2017 None on record
PATRICIA MARGARET DOWNEY Trustee 12 May 2013 None on record
FIONA MARTIN Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
MRS VICKY HALL Trustee 19 April 2015 None on record
MARK ANDREWS Trustee None on record