Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTH WEALD
Charity number: 1127815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Loretta Chalkley BAHonsMSc | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Reuben John Latchu BscMedElec | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Gelderbloem | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jack Brisley | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erica Sarah Taylor-Staley | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Alistair Hornsby BA | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Celia Burrell FRCOG.LLM | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Felicia Oluchi Onyechere | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Bowyer | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ruth Elizabeth Carter | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Ann Hill | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Joseph Russell | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew John Hill | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Grist | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nigel David Bennett | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Mary Tyler | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER COLIN LUCK BA, LLB | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV Jane Bradbury | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon Philip Tyler | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
KERRY LOUISA OLDFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MICHAEL ROGER BITSCHIN+ë | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS GILLIAN VERA JAYNE BITSCHIN+ë | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.