Trustees LONGTON MEMORIAL TENNIS CLUB
Charity number: 1129474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Parkin | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Syczewska | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lemon | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Declan Acornley | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ron Webster | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Allison Moosa | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Chris Rodd | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Stewart Tipping | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.