Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WOKING CHRIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1130005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Adrian Neill Beavis | Chair | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Emma Louise Dornan | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Nancy Burgess McHutchon | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip C W Jackson | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Kang Low | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Pearce | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Elisa Brown | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Hiorns | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Gale | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Adrian McFarland | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Mel Hemmings | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL WYTHE | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Roberts | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|||||
BERYL A KEELEY | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
REV MARTIN STANLEY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR STEVE MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV PHIL SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.