Trustees METHODIST CHURCH IN WALES - WALES SYNOD CYMRU
Charity number: 1128205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Judith Holliman | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Andrew Charlesworth | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Dionne Alicia Sherwood | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Gareth John Edwards | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Ffion Pennant Rowlinson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Keith Edwards | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Janet Elizabeth Park | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Susan Keegan von Allmen | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Richard Brian Gillion | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Malcolm Peacock | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Nicholas Christopher Sissons | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Jennifer Anne Hurd | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Howard David Long | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Ian David Morris | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
ALUN JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Christopher Jepson-Randall | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
BARRY JOHN HAWKINS | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Margaret Birch | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Martin Lougher | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Stephen John Boxall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
JANET MARY REES | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Linda Mary Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Webber | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
PATRICIA MARY PRESTON | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.