Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT PETER FARNBOROUGH
Charity number: 1127534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Timothy William Bateman | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Susan Ruthven | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA JAYNE REES MA | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leslie William Bolton | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WENDY GASKELL | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE COLE | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valda Margaretr Zillah Chester | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Audrey Seagrave | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rogers | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Shervington | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Coppock | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Steven Kelly | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benjamin James Perkins | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Stewart Price | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Jane Norbron | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Helen Fewings | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Neil Eric Seagrave | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV RICHARD NEVILL COBBOLD | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW LINN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVE ROWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.