Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.MARK'S HAYDOCK
Charity number: 1128590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Dutton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josh Thornhill | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Avril Chisnall | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lister | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev JAMES ANDREW WALLACE | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
GERALDINE SHAW | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN ANDREW DUNCAN | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kay WHITE | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE WILKINSON | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CARSON | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH DENNO | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CARSON | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LARISSA PEARN | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HEYES | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Cockram | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAN LEATHERS | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHRISTOPHER DENNO | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRENDEN GEORGE LISTER | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUE ASHCROFT | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ANNE CONWAY | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE CARSON | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|||||
IRENE MCGINN | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON PETER CONWAY | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
LES GREENALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA JEAN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERNA GLENIS JOLLY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.