Trustees BUCKLEY AND DEESIDE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1133745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
44 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELLEN JONES | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER BARCLAY | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shan Eleri Davies | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE KAREN JONES | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
PAMELA HICKS PARRY | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH JOHN MAXWELL | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Thomson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW JONATHAN BRADLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL ASHTON | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Warby | Trustee | 10 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON MARGARET NOLAN | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARIE DAVIES | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE RUTH DOWELL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA MYFANWY LUXTON | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE EVANS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE PARISH | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARY EVANS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN JUNE MATKIN | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUSAN PRITCHARD | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS Georgina Anne Grass | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Patricia Christopher | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Commins | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FARNSWORTH | Trustee | 05 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANNE FARNSWORTH | Trustee | 05 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE REID | Trustee | 05 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL FRANCIS | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CLARKE BEVAN | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
WILFRED MALCOLM ELLIS | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PRISCILLA SHAW | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ELIZABETH WALKER | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANTHONY BLAINEY | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROL BROOKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARLTON EDWARD JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA JUNE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA FORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev BERNARD CLIFFORD NIXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERENCE GEORGE HEWITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IDRIS WIGGLESWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA MARY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV ELAINE MARGARET HODGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev ANTON HILARY DOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID NOEL THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.