Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF CRANHAM PARK
Charity number: 1128304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Rose | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ANN JEE | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Martin Bright | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Malone | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT TERENCE EDWARDS | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Francis Twine | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Alexandra Newall | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Joy Cottrell | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Neil Barrett | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christine Rose | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tomlin | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chikezie Apakama | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carly Lucas | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ijeoma Blunt | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kenneth Ronald Perkins | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Peter James Newall | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip John Wright | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
STUART BECK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.