Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CUTHBERTS, FULWOOD
Charity number: 1127997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Mark James Bradford | Chair | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Harrison | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Calder | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ramsay | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Walter Martin Wootton | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Hilary Elkins | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Walker | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Fullalove | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne King | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Martin McDonald | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Laura Walker | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Harwood | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Sture | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Moorby | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rogers | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bev Calder | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Elizabeth Cragg | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.