Trustees HIGH STREET METHODIST CHURCH WITNEY
Charity number: 1129034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jason Cooke | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rebekah Coleman | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Maycock | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Miller | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Andrew Biggs | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Williamson | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Heather Davies | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Leslie Beechey | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Linda Burbage | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE DONOGUE | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Anne Robinson | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev Fred Ireland | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
JANET BUCKLE | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Helen James | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
JANE HEATH | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET WRIGHT BSC | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
IAN COTTON | Trustee | 16 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Keith Early Crawford | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ANNE EMILY CRAWFORD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVE RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ANN PAULIN WORRALL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JEANETTE MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.