THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HORSELL

Charity number: 1128175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Patricia Martin Bugler Trustee 08 January 2018 None on record
Brian John Lester Sheriff Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
MARGARET KATHLEEN JOHNSON Trustee 31 October 2012 None on record
Helen Teresa Edwards Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
Pamela Jane Rowe Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
MARK MCMURTRIE Trustee None on record
Brian Eric Rowlatt Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record
DAVID ROBERT LEACH Trustee 19 May 2015 None on record
Jennifer Richards Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
LESLEY FRANCES TEMPLEMAN Trustee None on record
RUTH CARTER Trustee None on record
Sarah Jane Gladstone HND Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Rev SARAH ELIZABETH HAYES Chair 15 October 2013
BIBLE READING FELLOWSHIP Received: On time
HENRY SMITH'S CHARITY Overdue by 170 days
ELIZA BACK FOR THE PARISH ROOM (KNOWN AS THE HORSELL PARISH INSTITUTE AND CLUB ROOM) Received: On time
MRS GILL SQUIBB Trustee None on record
Michael Couper Trustee None on record