Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS & ALL SAINT'S WORCESTER

Charity number: 1128121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £407.19k £473.83k £545.13k £718.82k £618.37k
Total expenditure £336.03k £603.51k £442.62k £504.82k £497.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £15.00k £25.00k £119.69k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £532.93k £707.77k £585.81k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £2.47k £3.18k £2.44k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £129 £21 £51
Income - Other N/A N/A £9.60k £7.85k £30.07k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £419.90k £498.88k £495.43k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £22.72k £2.58k £2.13k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £3.36k £0