Trustees WILMSLOW METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1129459
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Andrew Richards | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Dean | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER VAUX COWARD | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Patricia Ann Bourne | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lily Saxton | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bateson Evans | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Maria Coe BSc, PhD | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Singer BA | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dave Tonks | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|||||
REV Philip Peacock | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ann Rosemary Thompson | Trustee | 03 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Kennedy | Trustee | 19 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
GWYNETH HOLT | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOCELYN IRENE MARGARET FALLOWS | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Goddard | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN HOUGHTON BA ALCM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER DAVID GODDARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JENNY DEVERELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE CHRISTINE HASSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BILL DEVERELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
AVRIL MARY TUCKER BENG | Trustee |
|
||||||
IAN DOUGLAS KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON DAVID PERRY BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.